MA H2984 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4997
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the amount of the deduction on taxable income for rent. Revenue.
Title
Relative to affordable rental housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4997 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-01 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday April 6, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 6, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H1392 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1393 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1398 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1399 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1389 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H4997 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H1392 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1393 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1398 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1399 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1389 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H4997 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2984 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2984.pdf |