MA H2975 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require insurance companies to reimburse licensed athletic trainers for certain services. Financial Services.
Title
Promoting consumer choice in health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S557 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S509 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H479 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H481 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1448 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3661 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S557 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S509 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H479 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H481 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1448 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3661 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2975 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2975.pdf |