MA H297 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish fair deadlines for business to business invoice settlements based on the size of the payable and receivable business entities. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to small business payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5027 |
2021-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3077 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1861 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H300 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S153 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5027 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2953 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3077 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1861 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H300 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S153 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5027 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2953 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H297 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H297.pdf |