MA H2937 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4624

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to tax deeds and protecting equity for homeowners facing foreclosure. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to tax deeds and protecting equity for homeowners facing foreclosure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4624
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4624 (Replaced by) 2024-05-13 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback