MA H2930 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2915
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide municipalities with the option to freeze residential tax rate or valuation for the elderly with means tested criteria. Revenue.
Title
To provide municipalities with the option to freeze residential tax rate or valuation for the elderly with means tested criteria
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Accompanied H2915 |
2022-04-01 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday April 6, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 6, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2915 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2930 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2930.pdf |