MA H2898 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4728

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for an oil tank removal tax credit for residents in manufactured housing communities. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to tax credits for residents in manufactured housing communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4728
2023-06-01JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4728 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback