MA H2893 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to municipal energy use disclosure and reporting. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to municipal energy use disclosure and reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2764 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H696 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3410 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H686 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1081 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S1849 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1284 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H564 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4642
H666 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2299 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H4087 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2019
H4261 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H696 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3410 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H686 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1081 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S1849 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1284 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H564 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4642
H666 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2299 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H4087 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2019
H4261 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2893.pdf |