MA H2887 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to an energy assessment and a residential energy performance label system for use by sellers of residential dwellings. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to home energy efficiency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-05-28JointHearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H1441 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback