MA H2877 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to solar power equity in low-income and environmental justice communities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to solar power equity in low-income and environmental justice communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-06-20JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H829 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1064 (Similar To) 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2903 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H184 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H183 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1276 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4096 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback