MA H2873 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to promoting zero-emission vehicles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting zero-emission vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H2809 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H2993 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback