MA H2872 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the transition to a clean, sustainable, and equitable transportation system. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote the transition to clean transportation fleets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1190 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2104 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3134 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H4002 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S2341 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1884 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1090 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - House concurred
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback