MA H2864 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit companies from charging ratepayers for the construction or expansion of interstate gas infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting ratepayers from gas pipeline expansion costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H861 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1980 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1970 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2006 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1754 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S506 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1975 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1988 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback