MA H2849 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reduce greenhouse gas emissions by reducing energy use, increasing efficiency and encouraging renewable sources of energy and other energy policies. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For utility transition to using renewable energy (FUTURE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1940 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
S2001 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
S2003 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1993 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1945 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback