MA H2848 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to natural gas leaks. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring gas safety and consumer fairness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1966 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - House concurred
H2845 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback