MA H2836 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 100-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to renewable energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Re-powering Massachusetts with 100 percent renewable energy

Sponsors

Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1945 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback