MA H2832 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reduce the sales tax and limit the compensation of certain public employees. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to taxpayers in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2409 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3906 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3114 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1843 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2859 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1944 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback