MA H283 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Raynham be authorized to grant two additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Raynham to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-11-15 | House | Enacted |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-05-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-04-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4588 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4688
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H283.pdf |