MA H2826 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4638

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to registered interior designers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to advancing the profession of interior design

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4638
2017-06-23JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S132 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1171 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1194 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S208 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3878 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2959 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2289 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback