MA H2810 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the promotion of green infrastructure and reduction of carbon emissions. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote green infrastructure and reduce carbon emissions

Sponsors

Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-07JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2018 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback