MA H2802 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4405

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to to secure a clean energy future and provide comprehensive solutions to the climate crisis. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To secure a clean energy future

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4405
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H2894 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2005 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
S1941 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S523 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1977 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H575 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4182
H2831 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback