MA H2797 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-14)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Velis of Westfield, a petition of John C. Velis and others that the Honor and Remember Flag be designated as the symbol of the Commonwealth’s concern and commitment to honoring and remembering the lives of all members of the United States Armed Forces who lost their lives while serving. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to recognition of the "Honor and Remember" flag in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2161 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H2313 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2171 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1868 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback