MA H2791 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4161
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing first responders day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Declaring March the 26th as First Responders Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4161 |
2016-04-04 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2015-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4161 (Replaced by) 2016-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2016
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2791.pdf |