MA H2783 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain payments in property sales by nonprofit organizations. Revenue.
Title
Relative to property sales by nonprofit organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3122 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2035 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1244 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2058 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1985 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2035 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1244 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2058 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1985 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2783 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2783.pdf |