MA H2769 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of the surviving beneficiary of Robert Lawler. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of the surviving beneficiary of Robert Lawler
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2668 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3654 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2619 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2729 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3654 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2619 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2729 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2769 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2769.pdf |