MA H2765 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Norwell be authorized to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Norwell to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-01-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-12-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-11-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1921 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2765 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2765.pdf |