MA H2761 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to holders of a learner’s permit or Junior Operator driver’s license. Transportation.
Title
Relative to student driver safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-12-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-08-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1793 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2720 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2226 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2720 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2226 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2761 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2761.pdf |