MA H2745 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to boater safety and certification. Transportation.
Title
Relative to boater safety
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4597 |
2017-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1347 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3464 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2032 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S258 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S741 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2025 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2820 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H2446 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3464 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2032 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S258 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S741 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2025 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2820 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H2446 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2745.pdf |