MA H2730 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the retirement benefits of certain public safety employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further regulating the retirement benefits of certain public safety employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2637 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2611 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2553 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - House concurred
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback