MA H2726 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to a post-traumatic stress disorder presumption for certain retirement benefits. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the disability or death caused by post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-21HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-07-02JointHearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2403 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H2456 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1691 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2112 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback