MA H2722 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Group Insurance Commission premium contributions. Public Service.
Title
Establishing fairness in GIC premium contributions
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5206 |
2021-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S683 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2864 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1168 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H3323 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1205 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2881
H5206 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2864 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1168 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H3323 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1205 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2881
H5206 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2722 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2722.pdf |