MA H2712 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the Fort Devens Museum as the official veterans and military museum of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the Fort Devens Museum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-08-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-08-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2019-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2712 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2712.pdf |