MA H270 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4906
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to autism education reform and to facilitate appropriate interactions with persons on the autism spectrum. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to autism education reform
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Turco [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4906 |
2021-12-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H621 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
S1069 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3234 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S1641 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1502 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1051 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H4906 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1645 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
H3478 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5212
S1578 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2969
S1069 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3234 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S1641 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1502 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1051 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H4906 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1645 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
H3478 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5212
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H270 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H270.pdf |