MA H2653 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize municipalities to assess certain taxes for financing regional transportation needs and investments. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regional transportation ballot initiatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1694 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback