MA H2634 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4244

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the application of the local option room occupancy excise tax in the town of Brewster. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing local aid enhancement for the town of Brewster

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4244
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H1951 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2642 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3917
H1637 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3354 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4619 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback