MA H2617 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing a tax credit for manufacturing employees training. Revenue.
Title
Relative to providing a tax credit for employee training
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
Rep. Donald Wong [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2449 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2449 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2617 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2617.pdf |