MA H2609 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the property tax deferral for certain elderly persons. Revenue.
Title
Increasing the property tax deferral for seniors
Sponsors
Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2505 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3305 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1616 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2657 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1764 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1707 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3305 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1616 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2657 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1764 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1707 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2609 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2609.pdf |