MA H2605 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement benefits for Brian P. Costello, Jr. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Brian P. Costello Jr
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1731 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2426 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1776 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1731 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2426 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2605 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2605.pdf |