MA H2604 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to mandatory coverage for certain health screenings for firefighters. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mandatory coverage for certain health screenings for firefighters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2021-06-03JointHearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-03JointHearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-03JointHearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3529 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
S2398 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1704 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2592 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2498 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2674 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2676 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3630 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
S1425 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2683 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2668 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2629 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2943 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S1747 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1739 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback