MA H2579 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a review of existing staffing levels of environmental police officers in the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Relative to protecting the natural resources of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-27 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4634 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2579.pdf |