MA H2573 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to workers’ compensation benefits for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to ensuring fairness in public employee workers compensation benefits
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2573.pdf |