MA H2561 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to valuation of public pension systems on a calendar year basis. Public Service.
Title
Relating to Valuation of Pension Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1636 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4066
H3350 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
H3299 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4066 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3350 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
H3299 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4066 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2561 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2561.pdf |