MA H2535 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H2653

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize municipalities to assess certain taxes for financing regional transportation needs and investments. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regional transportation ballot initiatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseAccompanied H2653
2020-05-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-09HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-12HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 10, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H1838 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
H511 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2595 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3134 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Senate concurred
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S1884 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1702 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S1190 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2104 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-07-06 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4244 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2653 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback