MA H2527 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-04SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-13JointHearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1650 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback