MA H2494 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further amend the anti-shackling statute for incarcerated pregnant women. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure compliance with the anti-shackling law for pregnant incarcerated women

Sponsors

Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Sen. Thomas McGee [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. James Cantwell [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Stephen Kulik [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Juana Matias [D]Rep. Keiko Orrall [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-11HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-09-26JointHearing rescheduled to 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1359 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback