MA H2435 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5128

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the assessment of real property for local taxation purposes. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the assessment of real property for purposes of local taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5128
2019-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H216 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback