MA H2430 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of community preservation funds for the acquisition of artificial turf for athletic fields. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the use of community preservation funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3112 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H955 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3152 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3481 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H946 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H134 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4203 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2019
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H955 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3152 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3481 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H946 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H134 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4203 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2019
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2430 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2430.pdf |