MA H241 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restrict sales of certain items and products at flea markets, so-called. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Restricting the sale of certain items at flea markets,
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H258 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H230 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H210 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H230 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H210 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H241 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H241.pdf |