MA H2407 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the membership of the Peace Officer Standards and Training Commission. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to membership on the POST commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-11HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-12-04JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2408 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Senate concurred
H2378 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Senate concurred
S2522 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4479 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4818 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback