MA H2406 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to immunity from prosecution for certain first responders for providing or transferring opioid antagonists to certain persons. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to furthering the success of opiate intervention programs
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-06-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S826 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2676
S307 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2841
S839 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2646
S2676 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S307 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2841
S839 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2646
S2676 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2406 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2406.pdf |