MA H2405 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to kayak safety. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to kayak safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-06-13HouseRules suspended
2024-06-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-05-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-04-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-11HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-01JointHearing scheduled for 06/07/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H611 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H4002 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback